Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009130838 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007300149 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4907500B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2012 | B2 | JP2009129951 | 11.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007300149 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2063692 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2007300149 | 20.11.2007 |