EP2063692 - Method of forming conductive bumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 80 Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakaguchi, Hideaki c/o Shinko Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP | 02 /
Higashi, Mitsutoshi c/o Shinko Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08168330.2 | 05.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | JP20070300149 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007300149 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063692 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/40 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H05K3/3478 (EP,US);
H01L21/4853 (EP,US);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03828 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05001 (US);
H01L2224/05009 (US);
H01L2224/05567 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0557 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11002 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11003 (EP,US);
H01L2224/111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11334 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11822 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11901 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13022 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81011 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81193 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0001 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10234 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0001, H01L2224/13099 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausbilden leitfähiger Kontaktierungshöcker | [2009/22] | English: | Method of forming conductive bumps | [2009/22] | French: | Procédé de formation de bosses conducteurs | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH0951050 | JPH09107045 | JPH1154557 |