EP2058510 - Internal combustion engine having a fuel injector designed to minimize mechanical stress on fuel pressure sensor installed therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/20] | Fuel injector designed to minimize mechanical stress on fuel pressure sensor installed therein | ||
[2014/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-city Aichi-pref. 445-0012 / JP | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Jun Intellectual Property Department c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Taguchi, Tooru Intellectual Property Department c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Arikawa, Fumiaki c/o NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-city Aichi 445-0012 / JP | [2015/19] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
Kondo, Jun Intellectual Property Department c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | ||
02 /
Taguchi, Tooru Intellectual Property Department c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
03 /
Arikawa, Fumiaki c/o NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-city Aichi 445-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/19] |
Former [2009/20] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08168395.5 | 05.11.2008 | [2009/20] | Priority number, date | JP20070289077 | 06.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007289077 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2058510 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2058510 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/16, // F02M47/02, F02M51/06, F02M63/00 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M57/005 (EP,US);
F02M61/14 (EP,US);
F02M2200/24 (EP,US);
F02M63/0026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/19] |
Former [2010/03] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbrennungsmotor mit einem Treibstoffeinspritzer zur Minimierung der mechanischen Belastung auf dem darin installierten Treibstoffdrucksensor | [2014/49] | English: | Internal combustion engine having a fuel injector designed to minimize mechanical stress on fuel pressure sensor installed therein | [2014/49] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne avec un injecteur de carburant prévu pour minimiser la contrainte mécanique sur le capteur de pression du carburant installé dans celui-ci | [2014/49] |
Former [2009/20] | Treibstoffeinspritzer zur Minimierung der mechanischen Belastung auf dem darin installierten Treibstoffdruck | ||
Former [2009/20] | Fuel injector designed to minimize mechanical stress on fuel pressure sensor installed therein | ||
Former [2009/20] | Injecteur de carburant prévu pour minimiser la contrainte mécanique sur le capteur de pression du carburant installé dans celui-ci | Examination procedure | 11.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 14.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4438496 (OHIE TOMONORI [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XY]US5890653 (KELLY WILLIAM W [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 50 - line 60 * * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 12 * * figures 1,2a,2b,3,5 * [Y] 3,5; | [A]DE10157886 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1321660 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US6622549 (WLODARCZYK MAREK T [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 54-58 * * column 3, lines 30-47 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3,5; | [Y]JP2006070800 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 3,5 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US7216630 (MARTIN STEFFEN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, line 45 - line 61 * * column 9, line 19 - line 42 * * figure 1 * | Examination | US6497223 | by applicant | US5890653 | JP2000265892 | US6497223 | US6622549 | JP2006070800 |