Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2184405 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2012 | B1 | EP2184405 | 12.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09174957 | 03.11.2009 | EP08168528 | 06.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2184405T | 31.01.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09174957 | 03.11.2009 | EP08168528 | 06.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2184406 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08168528 | 06.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2184405T | 26.11.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08168528 | 06.11.2008 |