EP2062615 - Composition comprising a modified cellulose derivative, a fatty acid ester and oxidising dyes, dyeing method for oxidation and use. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states L'Oreal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audousset, Marie-Pascale 1, Allée Louis Jouvet 92600, Asnieres / FR | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2009/22] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 Münich / DE | Application number, filing date | 08168553.9 | 07.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | FR20070058913 | 09.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0758913 | [2009/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2062615 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2062615 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062615 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2062615 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/10, A61K8/73, A61K8/42, A61K8/36, A61K8/37 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (KR);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/85 (KR);
A61Q5/10 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | A61Q5/10, A61K8/73, A61K8/42, A61K8/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung, die ein modifiziertes Zellulosederivat, einen Fettsäureester und Oxydationsfarbstoffe umfasst, Oxydationsfärbe- und Anwendungsverfahren | [2009/22] | English: | Composition comprising a modified cellulose derivative, a fatty acid ester and oxidising dyes, dyeing method for oxidation and use. | [2009/22] | French: | Composition comprenant un dérivé de cellulose modifié, un ester d'acide gras et des colorants d'oxydation, procédé de teinture d'oxydation et utilisation | [2013/13] |
Former [2009/22] | Composition comprenant un dérivé de cellulose modifie, un ester d'acide gras et des colorants d'oxydation, procédé de teinture d'oxydation et utilisation. | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 10.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13154932.1 Application withdrawn : 22.03.2013 | EP13160630.3 / EP2647409 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2016
13.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/46] | 14.11.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.03.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.09.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.01.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T1858/18 | 06.09.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2008 | AT | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MT | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | IE | 07.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.11.2008 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.11.2008 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9803150 (OREAL [FR], et al) [AD] 1-15 * example - *; | [A]WO03053329 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,8-17,19,32-39 * * page 38, line 23 - line 25 ** page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 17 *; | [A]EP1426032 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] - [0022] - [0031] - [0041] *; | [X]EP1707190 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0033] - [0035] - [0082] - [0110]; example - *; | [X]EP1707183 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0017] , [0031] - [0034] - [0083] - [0091] * | by applicant | GB1026978 | GB1153196 | DE2359399 | FR2586913 | JPS63169571 | DE3843892 | JPH0563124 | DE4133957 | WO9408969 | WO9408970 | WO9615765 | FR2733749 | EP0770375 | DE19543988 | FR2750048 | WO9803150 | FR2801308 | Opposition | WO9803150 | WO9917724 | EP1142557 | EP1426039 | EP1707190 | EP1707183 | EP1707182 | - John A. Wenninger, G.N. McEwen, International Cosmetic Ingredient Handbook, seventh edition, CTFA, (19970000), vol. 3, page 1829, 1920, 2133, 2136, 2282, 2310, 2342, ISBN 1-882621-20-4, XP055318023 | - Anonymous, "PEG-8 Dioleate", Personal Care Products Council, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2016, XP055320464 | - Anonymous, "PEG-12 Dilaurate", Personal Care Products Council, (20000000), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2008, XP055320477 | - Anonymous, "Polysorbate 85", Personal Care Products Council, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2459, XP055320479 | - Anonymous, "PEG-9 Stearate", Personal Care Products Council, (20161006), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2214, XP055320528 | - Anonymous, "PEG-20 Glyceryl Isostearate", Personal Care Products Council, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=3915, XP055320602 | - Anonymous, "Glyceryl Isotearate", Personal Care Products Council, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=1087, XP055320609 | - Anonymous, "Polysorbate-80", Personal Care Products Council, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2457, XP055320614 | - Anonymous, "PEG-60 Hydrogenated Castor Oil", Personal Care Products Council, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2066, XP055320620 | - Anonymous, "Polysorbate-40", Personal Care Products Council, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2453, XP055320628 | - Anonymous, "PEG-30 Stearate", Personal Care Products, (20150100), URL: http://webdictionary.personalcarecouncil.org/jsp/IngredientDetail.jsp?monoid=2221, XP055320630 | - "NATROSOL®PLUS CS , Grade 330, hydrophobically modified hydroxyethylcellulose (HMHEC)", Hercules Product Data 4032-3, (19941000), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.in-cosmetics.com/__novadocuments/2234, XP002690848 |