EP2060441 - Method for automatically adjusting the light beam of a headlight device to road traffic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Vision Propriété Industrielle 34, Rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiss, Benoît 37, rue du Général Leclerc 95600 Eaubonne / FR | 02 /
Grimm, Martin 31, Allée Maisons Russes 93340 Le Raincy / FR | [2009/21] | Application number, filing date | 08168557.0 | 07.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | FR20070007977 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0707977 | [2009/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060441 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060441 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/14 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B60Q1/143 (EP);
B60Q2300/056 (EP);
B60Q2300/324 (EP);
B60Q2300/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Anpassung des Lichtstrahls eines Fahrzeugscheinwerfers an den Strassenverkehr | [2009/21] | English: | Method for automatically adjusting the light beam of a headlight device to road traffic | [2009/21] | French: | Procédé d'adaptation automatique au trafic routier d'un faisceau lumineux de dispositif projecteur | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HR | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IE | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | MT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | NO | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | LU | 07.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 23.02.2011 | |
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1000265 (BAUMANNS HERBERT) [A] 1,2,4-6,12-14 * page 1, lines 36-70 * * page 2, lines 55-84 * * page 3, lines 56-63 - lines 83,84 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3341700 (FINCH DAN M) [A] 1,2,5-8,13,14 * figures 1-10 * * column 3, lines 44-61 * * column 7, lines 23-52 *; | [A]EP1707438 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP1769968 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [Y] 1-9,13,14 * figures 1-7; claims 1-6 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0030] , [0044] , [0053] * [A] 10-12; | [Y]EP1826476 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0008] - [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [PX]DE102006043281 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4-8,12-14* paragraphs [0024] , [0027] , [0033]; figures 1-9; claims 1-9 * |