EP2068512 - Apparatus and method for connection admission control in broadband wireless access system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Ki-Back No.103-1704, Imaechon Kumkang APT, Imae-dong, Bun Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Eun-Chan No.602-1603, Yangji Maeul Kumho APT, Sunae-dong Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/30] |
Former [2009/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08168576.0 | 07.11.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | KR20070113100 | 07.11.2007 Original published format: KR 20070113100 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2068512 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068512 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/54, H04L12/911, H04L12/801, H04L12/927 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
H04L47/805 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2612 (KR);
H04L47/15 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/83 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2017/30] |
Former [2010/07] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verbindungsannahmesteuerung in drahtlosen Breitbandzugriffssystem | [2009/24] | English: | Apparatus and method for connection admission control in broadband wireless access system | [2009/24] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour le contrôle de l'admission de connexion dans un système à accès sans fil à large bande | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | GB | 07.11.2017 | FR | 30.11.2017 | [2018/50] |
Former [2018/49] | IT | 26.07.2017 | |
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | IT | 26.07.2017 | |
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | NL | 26.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0917316 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); |