EP2184030 - Method of producing a dental restoration, dental restoration and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul, MN 55144-1000 / US | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jana, Carsten 3M ESPE AG Ossmaritzer Str. 1 07745 Jena / DE | 02 /
Burger, Bernd 3M ESPE AG Am Weinberg 27 82239 Alling / DE | 03 /
Hauptmann, Holger 3M ESPE AG Weilbergstr. 32 82404 Sindelsdorf / DE | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Brem, Roland 3M ESPE AG IP Department ESPE Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Brem, Roland 3M ESPE AG IP Department ESPE Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 08168721.2 | 10.11.2008 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184030 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, A61C13/083 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
A61C13/0006 (EP,US);
A61C13/0022 (EP,US);
A61C13/0835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Zahnersatzes, Zahnersatz und dessen Verwendung | [2010/19] | English: | Method of producing a dental restoration, dental restoration and use thereof | [2010/19] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une restauration dentaire, restauration dentaire et son utilisation | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008009495 (HERBST BREMER GOLDSCHLAEGEREI [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 1, line 2 - line 4 * * page 2, line 19 - line 28 *; | [A]WO9427517 (SANDVIK AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4176706 (BEEN LARRY C [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102005034803 | DE19944130 | DE102006033794 |