EP2184826 - Laser based lightning protection method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast- Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Heuvel, Johannes Cornelis Thea Beckmansingel 9 2652 GC Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08168766.7 | 10.11.2008 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184826 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02G13/00 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
H02G13/00 (EP);
H02G13/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/03] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Laserbasiertes Blitzschutzverfahren und -system | [2010/19] | English: | Laser based lightning protection method and system | [2010/19] | French: | Procédé et système de protection contre la foudre à base de laser | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US6072684 (EYBERT-BERARD ANDRE [FR], et al) [DY] 2,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5726855 (MOUROU GERARD [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [YA] - JÉRÔME KASPARIAN ET AL, "Electric events synchronized with laser filaments in thunderclouds", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20080410), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 5757 - 5763, XP002520849 [Y] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document * [A] 3,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.16.005757 | [Y] - JIABIN ZHU ET AL, "Long lifetime plasma channel in air generated by multiple femtosecond laser pulses and an external electrical field", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20060510), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 4915 - 4922, XP002520850 [Y] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.14.004915 | by applicant | US5175664 | US6072684 | - A. COUAIRON ET AL., "Femtosecond filamentation in transparent media", PHYSICS REPORTS, (2007), vol. 441, doi:doi:10.1016/j.physrep.2006.12.005, pages 47 - 189, XP022002336 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.physrep.2006.12.005 | - M. RODRIGUEZ ET AL., "Triggering and guiding of megavolt discharges using laser-induced ionized filaments", OPTICS LETTERS, (2002), vol. 27, pages 772 - 774, XP001116376 | - G. MEJEAN ET AL., "Improved laser triggering and guiding of megavolt discharges with dual fs-ns pulses", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2006), vol. 88, page 021101 | - R. ACKERMANN ET AL., "Triggering and guiding of megavolt discharges by laser-induced filaments under rain conditions", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2004), vol. 85, doi:doi:10.1063/1.1829165, pages 5781 - 5783, XP012063772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1829165 | - J. KASPARIAN, "Filaments of Light", AMERICAN SCIENTIST, (2006), vol. 94, page 150 |