EP2022483 - Skin cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mukherjee, Surajit Unilever Home & Personal Care USA 40 Merritt Boule Trumbull, NJ 06611 / US | 02 /
Rick, Donald 90 Highwood Drive Dumont, NJ 07628 / US | 03 /
Habif, Stephan, Samuel unilever Bestfoods NA, 800 Sylvan Avenue Englewood Cliffs, New Jersey 07632 / US | 04 /
Weinkauf, Ronni, Lynn 535 Prospect Avenue Oradell, New Jersey 07649 / US | [2009/16] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
Mukherjee, Surajit Unilever Home & Personal Care USA 40 Merritt Boule Trumbull, NJ 06611 / US | ||
02 /
Rick, Donald 90 Highwood Drive Dumont, NJ 07628 / US | |||
03 /
Habif, Stephan, Samuel 40 William Street Demarest, NJ 07627 / US | |||
04 /
Weinkauf, Ronni, Lynn 193 Adams Avenue River Edge, NJ 07661 / US | Representative(s) | Acham, Nicholas Clive Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Acham, Nicholas Clive Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | Acham, Nicholas Clive Unilever Patent Group Colworth House, Sharnbrook Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08168883.0 | 14.02.2000 | [2009/07] | Priority number, date | US19990124959P | 18.03.1999 Original published format: US 124959 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022483 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61Q19/00 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/07] | Title | German: | Hautkosmetikzusammensetzung | [2009/07] | English: | Skin cosmetic composition | [2009/07] | French: | Composition cosmétique cutanée | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00907563.1 / EP1169015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9740813 (HYDROMER INC [US], et al) [X] 1* claims 1,6,12,16 * | by applicant | US4105783 | US5063057 | EP0691126 | US5618850 | - Transdermal Delivery of Drugs, CRC PRESS, INC, (1987), vol. III, pages 7 - 8 | - SAH ET AL., J. COSMET. SCI., (1998), vol. 49, pages 257 - 273 | - SNEDECOR; COCHRAN, Statistical Methods, IOWA STATE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1980), pages 84 - 86 |