Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2060236 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2060236



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 142
28.02.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.04.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
28.03.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.03.2013 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.03.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.11.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.11.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
31.05.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2012 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.04.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
24.04.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.04.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
24.04.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
24.04.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.11.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.10.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.10.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
05.10.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
23.04.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.04.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
30.03.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.03.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed Search / examination 1
26.02.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.12.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
20.12.2008 Priority document Search / examination 25
13.11.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.11.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
13.11.2008 Description Search / examination 15
13.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2008 Drawings Search / examination 6
13.11.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5