EP2060236 - Medical instrument for manipulating the uterus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Christian Liptinger Strasse 32 78576 Emmingen / DE | 02 /
Donnez, Jacques, Prof. Dr. 143 Avenue Grandchamp 1150 Brüssel / BE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169062.0 | 13.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | DE20071056388 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007056388 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2060236 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2060236 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060236 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/42 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
A61B17/4241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Medizinisches Instrument zum Manipulieren einer Gebärmutter | [2009/21] | English: | Medical instrument for manipulating the uterus | [2009/21] | French: | Instrument médical destiné à la manipulation de l'utérus | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2008 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | HR | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | MT | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | ES | 04.08.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | AT | 13.11.2013 | IE | 13.11.2013 | LU | 13.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.11.2008 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0400458 (WECK & CO INC EDWARD [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XD]US2003187334 (BISWAS NICHOLAS [AU]) [XD] 1 * figure - *; | [X]US2005277948 (CEDARS LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [XP]WO2008074054 (SINGH JIWAN STEVEN [AU]) [XP] 1* figure 1 * |