EP2060653 - Slurry diffusion aluminide coating composition and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavanaugh, Dennis William 2 Irish Moss Court Simpsonville, SC 29680 / US | 02 /
Hardwicke, Canan Uslu 204 Winter Brook Lane Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 03 /
O'Connell, Matthew James 1 Ellington Court Taylors, SC 29687 / US | 04 /
Moran, Todd Steven 10 Hammel Court Simpsonville, SC 29680 / US | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Szary, Anne Catherine London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Szary, Anne Catherine London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2009/21] | Szary, Anne Catherine London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08169187.5 | 14.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | US20070940507 | 15.11.2007 Original published format: US 940507 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2060653 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2060653 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060653 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C10/20, C23C10/60 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
C23C10/20 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (KR);
C23C10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2011/51] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schlickerzusammensetzungen für Aluminiddiffusionsbeschichtungen | [2009/21] | English: | Slurry diffusion aluminide coating composition and process | [2009/21] | French: | Compositions de barbotine pour revêtements obtenues par diffusion en aluminure | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 14.10.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/30] | 22.08.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.03.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.06.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/49] | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 10.10.2012 | LI | 10.10.2012 | [2016/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004115355 (BAUER STEVEN EARL [US], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document * |