EP2187522 - Divider circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0722 / JP | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marton, Walter Wilhelm-Beer-Weg 60 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Braun, Robert Hohenweg 42 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Holtby, Christopher Lawrence Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Holtby, Christopher Lawrence Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08169194.1 | 14.11.2008 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2187522 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03K23/66, H03L7/193, H03L7/197 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
H03L7/1978 (EP,US);
H03K23/667 (EP,US);
H03L7/193 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/04] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Frequenzteilerschaltung | [2010/20] | English: | Divider circuitry | [2010/20] | French: | Circuit de diviseur | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/22] | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0948138 (MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS [FR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0044]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]US5608354 (HORI HIDETOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,10,15 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, lines 54-59 * * column 9, lines 11-20; figures 1-8 * |