EP2060696 - Roof tile and method for manufacturing a roof tile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): HR | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordic Waterproofing Oy Puusepäntie 11 04360 Tuusula / FI | [2011/19] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Lemminkäinen Rakennustuotteet Oy Puusepäntie 11 04360 Tuusula / FI | ||
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Lemminkäinen Katto Oy Puusepäntie 11 04360 Tuusula / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Järvensivu, Kari Lepistöntie 11 08700, LOHJA / FI | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | Application number, filing date | 08169242.8 | 17.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | FI20070005813 | 15.11.2007 Original published format: FI 20075813 | [2009/21] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060696 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060696 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/26, E04D1/28 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
E04D1/26 (EP,US);
E04D1/28 (EP,US);
E04D1/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Dachplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Dachplatte | [2009/21] | English: | Roof tile and method for manufacturing a roof tile | [2009/21] | French: | Tuile et procédé de fabrication d'une tuile | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2010 | 16.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.2011 | BE | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | HR | 17.08.2011 | HU | 17.08.2011 | IT | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | LV | 17.08.2011 | MT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | IE | 17.11.2011 | LU | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | ES | 28.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | [2013/51] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
HU | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
LU | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
LU | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
LU | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
LU | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
HR | 28.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1585692 (THOMAS ROBINSON [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * figure 5 * * page 3, line 120 - line 124 *; | [XY]US1922501 (THOMAS ROBINSON) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,11 * figure 3 * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 4,6,7,12,13; | [Y]US2005252136 (HARDIN GEORGE [US]) [Y] 6,7,12,13 * figure 1D *; | [Y]US2006172643 (GREAVES GERALD G [US], et al) [Y] 4* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] *; | [XP]EP1985775 (IKO EUROP [BE]) [XP] 1,3 * figure 1 * |