EP2187211 - Diagnosis of diseases by measuring chemokinesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Jungen, Carmen Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Jungen, Carmen Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169345.9 | 18.11.2008 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2187211 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/5029 (EP);
G01N33/5091 (EP);
G01N33/574 (EP);
G01N2800/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Diagnose von Erkrankungen mittels Messung von Chemokinese | [2010/20] | English: | Diagnosis of diseases by measuring chemokinesis | [2010/20] | French: | Diagnostic de maladies en mesurant la chémocinétique | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/42] | 12.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007178534 (MURPHY CHRISTOPHER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5817763 (CERAMI ANTHONY [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007134657 (POZNANSKY MARK C [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008117195 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9420142 (BLOOD RES CENTER [US]; SPRINGER TIMOTHY A [US]; ROTH STEPHEN J [US]; C) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - WEBER C ET AL, "Interaction of very late antigen-4 with VCAM-1 supports transendothelial chemotaxis of monocytes by facilitating lateral migration.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 DEC 1998, (19981215), vol. 161, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6825 - 6834, XP002517700 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | - GU ET AL., J. CONTROL RELEASE, (2004), vol. 96, no. 3, pages 463 - 472 | - LI ET AL., ACTA PHARMACOL. SIN., (2006), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 754 - 759 | - NORRGREN ET AL., DEV. BIOL. STAND., (1983), vol. 55, pages 43 - 51 | - TATARD ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2005), vol. 26.17, pages 3727 - 3737 | - WALTENBERGER, J. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 102.2, pages 185 - 90 |