EP2073354 - Method of making an armature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, David J. 5315 Winter Moss Court Columbia, MD 21045 / US | 02 /
Stone, John C. 96 Farr Lane Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | 03 /
Tumberlinson, Robert 3438 Sticks Road Glen Rock, PA 17327 / US | 04 /
Ortt, Earl M 103 Crafton Road Bel Air, MD 21014 / US | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08169398.8 | 19.11.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | US20070943646 | 21.11.2007 Original published format: US 943646 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2073354 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2073354 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12, // H02K3/44 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
H02K3/44 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49009 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49011 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49071 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53148 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | H02K3/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Läufers | [2009/26] | English: | Method of making an armature | [2009/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un rotor | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 11.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2648018 (MEIER DONALD R) [X] 1,2,5-8 * columns 3,4; figure 1 * [I] 3,4,9-16; | [A]US2006255678 (DU HUNG T [US], et al) [A] 9-16* paragraphs [0116] , [0117] * | Examination | US4983866 |