EP2071832 - Display apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Dong-heon SK View Apt., 101-2103 Sindorim-dong, Guro-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kwon, Yong-hwan I-Park Bundang Apt. 202-2903, Jeongja-dong, Bunda Seongnam-si / KR | 03 /
Lee, Sang-hee Humanvill Apt., 103-1302, 456 Bukgajwa 2-dong, Se Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Won-il Jugong Apt 806-1005 Burim-dong, Gyeonggi-do Gwacheon-si / KR | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Fearnside, Andrew Simon Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2011/23] | Waddington, Richard Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Waddington, Richard Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08169419.2 | 19.11.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | KR20070127713 | 10.12.2007 Original published format: KR 20070127713 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2071832 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2071832 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (KR);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4854 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | H04N5/445, H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2011/14] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Ansteuerung | [2009/25] | English: | Display apparatus and control method thereof | [2009/25] | French: | Appareil d'affichage et son procédé de commande | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 04.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/18] | 20.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/18] | 17.12.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP13153713.6 / EP2590403 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002178446 (SIE JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0117] *; | [X]US2005160458 (BAUMGARTNER JOSEPH P [US]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0122] , [0158] , [0165] * * paragraphs [0174] - [0177] * | Examination | US2007244922 |