Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
11.09.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.06.2013 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
25.03.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.03.2013 | First examination report | |
11.03.2013 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.03.2013 | Definitive list of designations | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
08.02.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
05.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.11.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.08.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
29.06.2012 | Publication of search report | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
29.06.2012 | Change - classification | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
29.06.2012 | Change - classification | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
02.03.2012 | Change - classification | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
02.03.2012 | Change - classification | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
06.12.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.12.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.06.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |