EP2081246 - Fuel cell and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-743 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heo, Jin S. No. 102-903, Dongsuwon-LG-village Mangpo-dong, Yeongtong, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Hyun Chul No. 201-1202, 872 Haengnimmaeul-samsung-ramian -2nd Apt. Gisan-dong, Hwasung-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169524.9 | 20.11.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | KR20080005560 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: KR 20080005560 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081246 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2081246 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/06, H01M8/04 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/04029 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/15] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffzelle und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2009/30] | English: | Fuel cell and control method thereof | [2009/30] | French: | Pile à combustible et son procédé de commande | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 02.02.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005241232 (REINKE MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007]; claims 1-21 *; | [XI]JP2008004516 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 2-15; | [XI]JP2006179346 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0037] * [I] 2-15; | [Y]US2005255352 (MATOBA TADASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]US2263031 (ESTES EZRA L) [Y] 6 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6124053 (BERNARD RANDOLPH M [US], et al) [Y] 8 * column 4, lines 35-65 *; | [Y]US4650727 (VANDERBORGH NICHOLAS E [US], et al) [Y] 11 * claims 7,23 *; | [A]US2004209131 (BOLTON LESLIE WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2003118883 (BREAULT RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-23 *; | [A]EP1594181 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-47 *; | [Y]US2004068933 (NAKAMURA TORU [JP], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraphs [0123] , [0187] , [0192] *; | [A]KR100759693B (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 16 * the whole document *; | [AP]EP1883130 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 16 * paragraphs [0018] , [0032] *; | [A]US2005164046 (FUJIHARA SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 16 * paragraph [0012] *; | [Y]DE19962679 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 16 * column 4, lines 15-27 *; | [A]WO0103212 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 16 * page 11, lines 14-24 *; | [A]US2002160239 (CUTRIGHT RICHARD H [US], et al) [A] 16 * paragraph [0064] *; | [A]WO2004095618 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 16 * page 2, lines 16-22 *; | [A]DE4446841 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 16 * claims 7,8 * | by applicant | KR19980016383 | KR20030047158 |