EP2063090 - Control apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/02] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshioka, Mamoru c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2013/16] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Yoshioka, Mamoru c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/02] |
Former [2009/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169891.2 | 25.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | JP20070304835 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007304835 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063090 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063090 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F01N3/023 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
F01N3/035 (EP);
F02D41/029 (EP);
F01N2250/02 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/05] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [2009/22] | English: | Control apparatus for internal combustion engine | [2009/22] | French: | Appareil de contrôle pour moteur à combustion interne | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 31.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.01.2014 | [2016/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02086301 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, line 1 - line 7 * * page 10, line 11 - line 16 * * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 15 * * figures 10,11 *; | [PX]EP1953358 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [PX] 1 * paragraphs [0053] , [0057] , [0059] , [0060] , [0072] *; | [A]EP1510671 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023] *; | [A]EP0758713 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 21 - line 33 * * column 9, line 13 - line 33 * | by applicant | JP2005240719 | WO02086301 | EP1953358 | JP2005194981 | JP2006057461 | JP2005207286 | JP2007278186 | JPH0610738 |