EP2148031 - Hinges and door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sommer Metallbau-Stahlbau GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1 95182 Döhlau / DE | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sommer, Oliver Heiligengrabstraße 99 95028, Hof / DE | 02 /
Hautmann, Dieter Epprechtsteinweg 5 95126, Schwarzenbach / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2010/04] | 01 /
Sommer, Oliver Heiligengrabstraße 99 95028, Hof / DE | ||
02 /
Hautmann, Dieter Epprechtsteinweg 5 95126, Schwarzenbach / DE | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Skuhra, Udo Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08170341.5 | 01.12.2008 | [2010/04] | Priority number, date | DE20081040659 | 23.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008040659 | [2010/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148031 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2148031 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/00, E05D11/04 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
E05D11/04 (EP);
E05D7/0054 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FI, FR, GB, LI, SE [2016/26] |
Former [2010/39] | CH, DE, FI, FR, GB, LI, SE | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Türband sowie Tür | [2010/04] | English: | Hinges and door | [2010/04] | French: | Penture et porte | [2010/04] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 06.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/10] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
SE | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0803625 (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,11 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 17 * * column 5, line 24 - line 30 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 20 * * column 6, line 27 - line 33 * * figures 1-4; claims 1-4 * [Y] 3,4,12,13; | [XY]GB1137878 (HEINZ SCHURMANN & CO) [X] 1,2,6,11 * page 2, line 58 - line 104 * * page 2, line 126 - page 3, line 6; figures 1-4; claims 1,2 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]AU2153770 (HANSEN,GORANSSON) [Y] 3,4,8 * page 8, paragraph 8 * * sentence 17, paragraph 2 - sentence 18, paragraph 2; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]EP0791713 (CHARMAG SA [CH]) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 2 - line 12; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE29713254U (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [Y] 12,13 * page 7, line 19 - line 22 * * page 9, line 7 - line 14; figures 1-5 * | Examination | EP0962616 | BE440823 |