EP2068609 - Method for controlling the speed of a fan using a measurement of the ambient noise and electronic device implementing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2013/34] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mace, PHILIPPE THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648, BOULOGNE CEDEX / FR | 02 /
Guitton, Xavier THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648, BOULOGNE CEDEX / FR | 03 /
Benezeth, Philippe THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648, BOULOGNE CEDEX / FR | [2013/34] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
Mace, PHILIPPE THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648, BOULOGNE CEDEX / FR | ||
02 /
Guitton, Xavier THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648, BOULOGNE CEDEX / FR | |||
03 /
Benezeth, Philippe THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648, BOULOGNE CEDEX / FR | Representative(s) | Arnold, Klaus-Peter, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Arnold, Klaus-Peter, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Thies, Stephan, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | Benezeth, Philippe J.L. M., et al Thomson, 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 08170460.3 | 02.12.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | FR20070059552 | 04.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0759552 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2068609 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2068609 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068609 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/20, G05D23/19, H05K7/20 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
H05K7/20209 (EP);
G06F1/206 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H05K7/20, F24F11/00, G06F1/20, G05D23/19, G05D23/20 | ||
Former IPC [2009/24] | H05K7/20, F24F11/00, G06F1/20, G05D23/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/14] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Geschwindigkeitssteuerung eines Lüfters durch Messung des Umgebungslärms und dieses Verfahren implementierende elektronische Vorrichtung | [2009/24] | English: | Method for controlling the speed of a fan using a measurement of the ambient noise and electronic device implementing the method | [2009/24] | French: | Procédé de contrôle de la vitesse d'un ventilateur utilisant la mesure d'un bruit ambiant et dispositif électronique mettant en oeuvre le procédé | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 28.01.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.12.2013 | [2014/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004267990 (LIN WEN-YEN [TW]) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] - [0033]; figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0049] *; | [Y]WO0251228 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 28; figures 1-4 * * page 1, line 2 - line 4 * * page 2, line 10 - page 4, line 15 *; | [Y]WO2006046179 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12 * page 6, lines 6-25 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 12 * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 4; figures 1-3,5 * | by applicant | US2004267990 | WO2006046179 |