EP2072598 - Glue for packaging light emitting diode and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Andy Optoelectronic Co., Ltd. Xinan Street Industrial Zone Yuyao Zheijiang China 3154000 / CN | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhan, Xian-wu / Xinan Street Industrial Zone 3154000, Yuyao Zhejiang / CN | [2012/35] |
Former [2009/26] | 01 /
ZHAN, Xian-wu Xinan Street Industrial Zone 3154000, Yuyao Zhejiang / CN | Representative(s) | Jeannet, Olivier JEANNET & Associés 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Jeannet, Olivier Cabinet JEANNET 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 08170569.1 | 03.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | CN20071172633 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: CN200710172633 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072598 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09J183/04, H01L33/00, C09J183/05, C09J183/07 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
C09J183/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08G77/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/56 (KR);
H01L33/56 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Klebstoff zur Verpackung einer lichtemittierenden Diode und Verwendung damit | [2009/26] | English: | Glue for packaging light emitting diode and use thereof | [2009/26] | French: | Colle pour le conditionnement d'une diode électroluminescente et son utilisation | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004116640 (MIYOSHI KEI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018]; example 1 ** the whole document *; | [A]US2007148476 (KHANARIAN GARO [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0009] - [0020]; example 1 * * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007148476 |