EP2085352 - Drinks dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hartung, Reinhard Winkl 99 a 6234 Brandenberg / AT | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Bardehle Puschmann Borchert Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08170617.8 | 03.12.2008 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | DE20081027527 | 10.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008027527 | DE20081003042 | 02.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008003042 | [2009/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085352 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085352 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B67D3/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
B67D3/0029 (EP);
B67D3/0009 (EP);
B67D3/0058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Getränkedispenser | [2009/32] | English: | Drinks dispenser | [2009/32] | French: | Distributeur de boissons | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2011 | 31.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2011 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | HR | 16.11.2011 | HU | 16.11.2011 | IE | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | NO | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3333829 (MOORE DARRLLE D, et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 10 - line 29; figure - *; | [DX]DE19501238 (JOBMANN WOLFGANG GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1,2,6,9,10,14,15 * column 2, lines 48-57 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 37 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 27 * [X] 3-5,7,8,11-13; | [Y]USRE37696E (PARKER GLEN LESLIE [ZA]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 58; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102004005182 (NOSCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figure - * | by applicant | DE19501238 | other | DE19501238 |