EP2075130 - Coating device with short inking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schölzig, Jürgen Am Eiskeller 3 55126, Mainz / DE | [2009/27] | Application number, filing date | 08171038.6 | 09.12.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | DE20071062935 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007062935 | DE20081054411 | 09.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008054411 | [2009/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2075130 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2075130 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41F19/06, B41F23/08 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
B41F19/062 (EP);
B41F23/08 (EP);
B41P2219/22 (EP);
B41P2219/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beschichtungseinrichtung mit Kurzfarbwerk | [2009/27] | English: | Coating device with short inking system | [2009/27] | French: | Dispositif de revêtement équipé d'un dispositif d'encrage court | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.02.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 03.02.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.02.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/12] | 03.02.2014 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/48] | 01.02.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE202007004213U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * [Y] 4,8,10 [I] 6,7,9; | [Y]EP0546454 (KOCHSMEIER HANS HERMANN [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 34 - line 51 *; | [Y]DE19853593 (TECHNOTRANS AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * column 1, line 23 - line 25 *; | [YA]DE102004039732 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0014] , [0023] * [A] 4; | [X]WO2005100028 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * page 5, line 6 - line 13; figure 2 * * page 12, line 1 - line 10 *; | [A]US4357896 (FELDKAEMPER RICHARD) [A] 4 * column 2, line 1 - line 24 *; | [A]GB2074240 (GD SPA) [A] 8 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * | by applicant | EP0569520 |