EP2070782 - Attachment and supporting structure for a vehicle steering lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive Italia S.r.l. Corso Stati Uniti, 41 Torino / IT | For all designated states Fiat Group Automobiles S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli, 200 10135 Torino (TO) / IT | [2011/27] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states TRW Automotive Italia S.p.A Corso Stati Uniti, 41 10129 Torino / IT | ||
For all designated states Fiat Group Automobiles S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli, 200 10135 Torino (TO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graglia, Daniele Via Sambuy, 24 10026, SANTENA / IT | 02 /
Gherlone, Giuseppe c/o FIAT GROUP AUTOMOBILES S.p.A. Corso Agnelli, 200 10135, TORINO / IT | [2011/24] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Graglia, Daniele Via Sambuy, 24 10026, SANTENA / IT | ||
02 /
Gherlone, Giuseppe c/o FIAT GROUP AUTOMOBILES S.p.A. Corso Agnelli 10135, TORINO / IT | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08171142.6 | 09.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | IT2007TO00892 | 10.12.2007 Original published format: IT TO20070892 | [2009/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070782 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070782 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2070782 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/02 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B60R25/04 (EP);
B60R25/0211 (EP);
B60R25/2063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Befestigungs- und Halterungsanordnung für ein Kraftfahrzeuglenkradschloss | [2009/25] | English: | Attachment and supporting structure for a vehicle steering lock | [2009/25] | French: | Structure de montage et support pour une serrure de volant d'un véhicule. | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 13.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | BE | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HR | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IT | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | NO | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | IE | 09.12.2011 | LU | 09.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
NO | 15.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0094568 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US5548981 (KIRK RICHARD D [US]) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]EP0731005 (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 47 - column 8, line 17; figures 1-8 * * abstract *; | [A]US5636540 (MYERS GARY L [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US5730011 (TERAI TAKEHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP1564091 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE ITALIA S P A [IT]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |