EP2071065 - Heald frame for loom and loom equipped with such a frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAUBLI FAVERGES Place Robert Stäubli 74210 FAVERGES / FR | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pages, Jean-Pierre 47 rue de la Failleuche 74210 Faverges / FR | 02 /
Fumex, André 220, chemin des Romains 74210 Cons Sainte Colombe / FR | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08171294.5 | 11.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | FR20070059788 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0759788 | [2009/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071065 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2071065 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D03C9/06 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
D03C9/0675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, TR [2010/08] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Weblitzenrahmen für Webrahmen und mit diesem Litzenrahmen ausgestatteter Webrahmen | [2009/25] | English: | Heald frame for loom and loom equipped with such a frame | [2009/25] | French: | Cadre de lisses pour métier à tisser et métier à tisser équipé d'un tel cadre | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 18.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US1922922 (ISAAC ANDREWS) [AD] 1,16 * page 1, lines 46-62; figures 1,3 *; | [A]FR2137643 (GROB & CO AG) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE548200 (REMY WILMS) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 7-45; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]WO2004027134 (STAUBLI SA ETS [FR], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - "ALFORFIX: LE NOUVEAU CADRE HAUTE RESISTANCE DE GROB//", INDUSTRIE TEXTILE, STE SIPPE SARL, METZ, FR, (20021101), no. 1346, ISSN 0019-9176, page 65, XP001167680 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1540056 | US1922922 |