EP2196660 - Charging system for exhaust gas recirculation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Turbo Systems AG Bruggerstrasse 71a 5400 Baden / CH | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Codan, Ennio Mülacherstrasse 7 5212 Hausen bei Brugg / CH | 02 /
Mutter, Alexander Im Moos 14 79733 Göhrwihl / DE | 03 /
Fusstetter, Klaus Ehrendingerstrasse 41 5408 Ennetbaden / CH | 04 /
Bernasconi, Simone Holunderhof 1 8050 Zürich / CH | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 08171297.8 | 11.12.2008 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196660 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07, F02B37/007 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
F01N5/04 (EP);
F02B37/007 (EP);
F02M26/05 (EP);
F02M26/08 (EP);
F02M26/10 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/08] |
Former [2010/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufladesystem für Abgasrezirkulation | [2010/24] | English: | Charging system for exhaust gas recirculation | [2010/24] | French: | Système de chargement pour une recirculation de gaz d'échappement | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/28] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102004015108 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10152803 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0015791 (SEMT [FR]) [A] 5,6 * abstract *; | [A]DE3807372 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 7,9,10 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0707142 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US5657630 | DE4436732 |