EP2070928 - 7-azaindol-3-ylacrylamides active as kinase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES S.R.L. Viale Pasteur, 10 20014 Nerviano (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES S.r.l. Viale Pasteur, 10 20014 Nerviano (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casuscelli, Francesco Via S. Michele del Carso, 1 20020 Dairago(MI) / IT | 02 /
Mongelli, Nicola Via Tertulliano, 38 20137 Milan / IT | 03 /
Amici, Raffaella Via Eugenio Montale, 34 26845 Codogno (Lodi) / IT | 04 /
Traquandi, Gabriella Via Cilea, 106 20151 Milan / IT | 05 /
Menichincheri, Maria Via Felice Casati , 19 20124 Milan / IT | 06 /
Ermoli, Antonella Via Garibaldi, 13 20090 Buccinasco (MI) / IT | [2009/25] | Application number, filing date | 08171301.8 | 11.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | EP20070123050 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07123050 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070928 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P35/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/08] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Als Kinasehemmer wirkende 7-Azaindol-3-ylacrylamide | [2009/25] | English: | 7-azaindol-3-ylacrylamides active as kinase inhibitors | [2009/25] | French: | 7-azaindol-3-ylacrylamides actifs en tant qu'inhibiteurs de la kinase | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 18.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2013 | 31.12.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2014 | 31.12.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0198299 (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 6 - line 11 * * Formula (I); page 4 * | [A] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19891125), Database accession no. 1989:594716, URL: STN, XP002522942 [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [ ] - Y. NISHIKAWA ET AL., "Acrylamide derivatives as antiallergic agents. III. Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of N-[4-(4-diphenylmethyl-1-piperazinyl)butyl]- and N-[4-(4-diphenylmethylene-1-piperidyl)butyl]-3-heteroarylacrylamides", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO; JP, (1989), vol. 37, no. 3, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 684 - 687 | by applicant | - CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 3, pages 459 - 465 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 98, pages 10983 - 10985 | - J. CELL. SCI., (2001), vol. 114, pages 2903 - 2910 | - CIRC. RES., (2000), vol. 86, pages 15 - 23 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 89, pages 9267 - 9271 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 9133 - 9136 | - CELL. SIGNAL., (2002), vol. 14, pages 381 - 395 | - MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 17, pages 1595 - 1606 | - SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, pages 628 - 630 | - GENEV. DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 2905 - 2927 | - CURRENT BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 12, pages 1251 - 1255 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 21615 - 21622 | - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 263, pages 605 - 611 | - CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 2124 - 2129 | - NAT. CELL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 1, pages 500 - 506 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 1865 - 1868 | - J. CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 106, pages 493 - 499 | - NAT. MED., (2000), vol. 6, pages 1004 - 1010 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, (1996), vol. 93, pages 3636 - 3641 | - INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 64, pages 280 - 285 | - NATURE, (1999), vol. 401, pages 33 - 34 | - ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 2324 - 2330 | - NEUROSCI., (2000), vol. 20, pages 2875 - 2886 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD., (2001), vol. 98, pages 7200 - 7205 | - NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 355 - 365 | - NAT. REV. CANCER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 489 - 501 | - ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (2002), vol. 71, pages 333 - 374 | - MOL. CELL BIOL., (1999), vol. 19, pages 5083 - 5095 | - EMBO J., (2002), vol. 21, pages 3171 - 3181 | - GENE, (1998), vol. 211, pages 133 - 140 | - EMBO J., (1999), vol. 18, pages 5703 - 5713 | - CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 7110 - 7116 | - J. BIOL. CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, pages 10281 - 10290 | - NISHIKAWA, YOSHINORI ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1989), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 684 - 7 | - TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, (1996), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 2145 - 2150 |