EP2073071 - Ultra-Heated/Slightly Heated Steam Zones for Optimal Control of Water Content in Steam Fuser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated 3333 Coyote Hill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biegelsen, David K. 200 Mimosa Way Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | 02 /
Volkel, Armin R. 1026 Karen Way Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
Pattekar, Ashish 20350 Stevens Creek Blvd. No.320 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
Swartz, Lars-Erik 869 Russet Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08171721.7 | 16.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | US20070959394 | 18.12.2007 Original published format: US 959394 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2073071 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2073071 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2073071 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G03G15/2003 (EP,US);
G03G2215/20 (EP,US);
G03G2215/2006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/15] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ultraerhitzte/Leicht erhitzte Dampfbereiche zur optimalen Steuerung des Wasserinhalts in einem Dampffixierer | [2009/26] | English: | Ultra-Heated/Slightly Heated Steam Zones for Optimal Control of Water Content in Steam Fuser | [2009/26] | French: | Zones de vapeur ultra-chauffées/légèrement chauffées pour un contrôle optimal du contenu en eau dans un dispositif de fusion de vapeur | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 01.03.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003185607 (GOLDMAN GERD [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004126160 (KEIDEL FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003248395 (PFU LTD) [A] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2006085059 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3140159 (CARLSON CHESTER F) [A] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002090238 (BARTSCHER GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003185607 | US2004126160 | JP2003248395 |