EP2077366 - Device for manual emergency release of buried automatic systems for the movement of doors, gates and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GI.BI.DI. S.r.l. Via Abetone Brennero, 177/B 46025 Poggio Rusco / IT | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arosio, Oliviero Piazza Caduti di Via Fani, 7 20035, Lissone (MI) / IT | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08171750.6 | 16.12.2008 | [2009/28] | Priority number, date | IT2008MO00002 | 03.01.2008 Original published format: IT MO20080002 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2077366 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/10, E05F15/12 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
E05F15/603 (EP);
E05Y2201/244 (EP);
E05Y2201/248 (EP);
E05Y2400/3013 (EP);
E05Y2600/41 (EP);
E05Y2600/452 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur manuellen Notauslösung von vergrabenen Automatiksystemen zur Bewegung von Türen, Toren und dergleichen | [2009/28] | English: | Device for manual emergency release of buried automatic systems for the movement of doors, gates and the like | [2009/28] | French: | Dispositif de relâchement d'urgence manuel des systèmes automatiques enterrés pour le mouvement des ports, barrières et similaire | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 26.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |