EP2199856 - Cationic radiation curable compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loccufier, Johan IP Department 3622 Agfa Graphics NV Septestraat 27 2640, Mortsel / BE | [2013/32] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Loccufier, Johan IP Department 3622 Agfa Graphics NV Septestraat 27 2640, Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 08172167.2 | 18.12.2008 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199856 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199856 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038, C07C381/12, C07D303/28, C07D305/06, C07D335/16, G03F7/004 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
C07C381/12 (EP,US);
G03F7/038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | Kationische strahlungshärtbare Zusammensetzungen | [2010/25] | English: | Cationic radiation curable compositions | [2010/25] | French: | Compositions durcissables par radiation cationique | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2008 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | HR | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | MT | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | NO | 07.11.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | IE | 18.12.2013 | LU | 18.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.12.2008 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 07.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0510839 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] 1-13 * page 8; example 10 *; | [AD]JPH0841116 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [AD] 1-13* page 12; compound 36 *; | [X]US6395450 (PARK JAE-GEUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 8; example 6 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2008040648 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [T] - MAX PLANCK, The theory of heat radiation, SPRINGER, (1988), ISBN 0883185970, XP002530044 [T] 1-13 * page 16 * | by applicant | JPH0841116B | US3018262 | GB998949 | US4060420 | EP0118078 | EP0119425 | EP0120661 | EP0123937 | EP0510839 | US6310115 | WO03072568 | WO03072567 | GB2396153 | US2005119362 | WO2007003507 | WO2007118794 | WO2008074548 | - CRIVELLO ET AL., MACROMOL. SYMP., (2004), vol. 217, pages 47 - 61 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 147 - 152 | - CHO ET AL., EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, (2005), vol. 41, pages 367 - 374 | - KUNZE ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, A: CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 110, no. 2, pages 115 - 122 | - AYDOGAN ET AL., Photochemistry and UV Curing, (2006), pages 187 - 201 | - JOSEPH V. KOLESKE, Radiation Curing of Coatings, ASTM INTERNATIONAL, (2002), page 123 |