EP2075394 - Method for determining the depth of a rotor borehole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/27] | Method for manufacturing a lock cylinder | ||
[2017/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. Ed. Schulte Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Zylinderschloßfabrik Friedrichstrasse 243 42551 Velbert / DE | [2018/11] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states C. Ed. Schulte Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Zylinderschlossfabrik Friedrichstrasse 243 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kremer, Ralf Weizenstr. 4 45356, Essen / DE | [2018/11] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
Kremer, Ralf Weizenstr. 4 45356, Essen / DE | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08172317.3 | 19.12.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | DE20071063237 | 31.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007063237 | [2009/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2075394 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2075394 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05B27/00 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
E05B27/0057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2009/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Bohrtiefe einer Kernbohrung | [2017/20] | English: | Method for determining the depth of a rotor borehole | [2017/20] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la profondeur d'un perçage dans un barillet | [2017/20] |
Former [2009/27] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schließzylinders | ||
Former [2009/27] | Method for manufacturing a lock cylinder | ||
Former [2009/27] | Procédé de fabrication d'une serrure cylindrique | Examination procedure | 20.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2008 | CY | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.12.2008 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0771920 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1707711 (TALLERES ESCORIAZA SA [ES]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004045792 (DOM SICHERHEITSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004045792 | EP1707711 | EP0771920 |