Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
17.05.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2011 | Definitive list of designations | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
01.02.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.11.2010 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
24.06.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
28.05.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
28.05.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
28.05.2010 | First examination report | |
09.03.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant |