EP2072036 - Process for dyeing in the presence of an oxidizing agent and a organic amine, device therefor and ready-to-use composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/26] | Process for dyeing in the presence of an oxidizing agent and a particular organic amine, device therefor and ready-to-use composition | ||
[2013/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hercouet, Leïla 20 bis Avenue de Rosny 93360 Neuilly Plaisance / FR | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Wattremez, Catherine L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wattremez, Catherine L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2009/26] | Wattremez, Catherine L'OREAL River Plaza - DIPI 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 08172454.4 | 19.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | FR20070060277 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0760277 | [2009/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072036 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/22, A61K8/31, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/44, A61K8/49, A61K8/81, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/10 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/4946 (EP,US);
A61K8/4993 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | A61K8/41, A61Q5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Färben in Gegenwart eines Oxidationsmittels und eines organischen Amins, Vorrichtung und gebrauchsfertige Zusammensetzung | [2013/50] | English: | Process for dyeing in the presence of an oxidizing agent and a organic amine, device therefor and ready-to-use composition | [2013/50] | French: | Procédé de coloration en présence d'un agent oxidant et d'une amine organique, dispositif et composition prête à l'emploi | [2013/50] |
Former [2009/26] | Verfahren zum Färben in Gegenwart eines Oxidationsmittels und eines speziellen organischen Amins, Vorrichtung und gebrauchsfertige Zusammensetzung | ||
Former [2009/26] | Process for dyeing in the presence of an oxidizing agent and a particular organic amine, device therefor and ready-to-use composition | ||
Former [2009/26] | Procédé de coloration en présence d'un agent oxidant et d'une amine organique particulière, dispositif et composition prête à l'emploi | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1291006 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20* example 4; claim - *; | [A]EP1438951 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-20 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1598052 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * example -; claim - * | by applicant | GB1026978 | GB1153196 | FR2140205 | FR2189006 | DE2359399 | FR2285851 | EP0167952 | EP0167971 | JPS63169571 | DE3843892 | JPH02295912 | JPH0563124 | DE4133957 | WO9408969 | WO9408970 | WO9501772 | WO9515144 | WO9615765 | EP0714954 | FR2733749 | EP0770375 | DE19543988 | EP1006153 | FR2801308 | EP1378544 | EP1377264 | EP1377262 | EP1377261 | EP1377263 | EP1399425 | EP1399117 | EP1399116 | EP1408919 | EP1416909 | EP1433472 | EP1433474 | EP1433471 | EP1433473 | EP1619221 | EP1619220 | EP1634926 | EP1637566 | EP1672033 | EP1671954 | EP1671955 | EP1671951 | EP1671560 | WO2006063866 | WO2006063867 | WO2006063868 | WO2006063869 | EP1674073 | EP1679312 | - TODD; BYERS, "Volatile Silicone fluids for cosmetics", COSMETICS AND TOILETRIES, vol. 91, pages 27 - 32 | - COLOUR INDEX INTERNATIONAL | EP20060291333 |