EP2071968 - Protective helmet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainese S.p.A. Via dell'Artigianato, 35 36060 Molvena (VI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states Dainese S.p.A. Via dell'Artigianato, 35 36060 Molvena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dainese, Lino Dainese S.p.A. Via dell'Artigianato, 35 36060 Molvena, Vicenza / IT | [2011/42] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
Dainese, Lino Dainese S.p.A. Via dell'Artigianato, 35 36060 Molvena, Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2009/26] | 01 /
Dainese, Lino Dainese S.p.A. Via dell'Artigianato, 35 36060, Molvena, Vicenza / IT | Representative(s) | Manfrin, Marta, et al Società Italiana Brevetti Stradone San Fermo, 21 sc. B 37121 Verona / IT | [2009/26] | Application number, filing date | 08172460.1 | 19.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | IT2007RM00675 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: IT RM20070675 | [2009/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2071968 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2071968 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2071968 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/10, A42B3/28, A42B3/06 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A42B3/066 (EP);
A42B3/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | A42B3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Schutzhelm | [2009/26] | English: | Protective helmet | [2009/26] | French: | Casque de protection | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | HR | 19.10.2011 | HU | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | MT | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | IE | 19.12.2011 | LU | 19.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | NO | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | ES | 30.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
NO | 19.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4129339 (TOHO ZWEIRADZUBEHOERGESELLSCHA [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 3-53; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US5421035 (KLOSE ODO [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE29621145U (SCHOELLHORN ANDREAS DIPL ING F [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,6 *; | [XA]DE19615049 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,13 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 2; figure 1 * [A] 12,14-16; | [X]DE202004008248U (JOHN HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 4; claim 1 * |