EP2199349 - Resin composition, antifouling coating comprising barnacle antifoulant and processes of production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG B.V. Amsterdamseweg 14 1422 AD Uithoorn / NL | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vos, Marcel PPG B.V. Schiplaan 2-S 1974 LB, Ijmuiden / NL | 02 /
Broek, Albert Dirk PPG B.V. Scholeksterstraat 2 2352 EE, Leiderdorp / NL | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Walsh, David Patrick Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Walsh, David Patrick Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08172476.7 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199349 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, C08F8/42, C08F230/06 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C09D5/1625 (EP);
C09D5/16 (KR);
C08F230/06 (KR);
C08F8/42 (KR);
C09D143/00 (KR);
C09D5/1606 (KR);
C09D5/165 (EP);
C09D5/1662 (KR);
C09D5/1687 (EP);
C09D7/40 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/09] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung, fäulnisverhindernde Beschichtung gegen Seepocken und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/25] | English: | Resin composition, antifouling coating comprising barnacle antifoulant and processes of production thereof | [2010/25] | French: | Composition de résine, revêtement antisalissure contre la bernache et procédé de production | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2002284786 ; | [DA]EP1245592 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-21* table 2 *; | [E]EP2006336 (SIGMAKALON B V [NL]) [E] 1,2,7-9 * the whole document *; | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 52, Database accession no. 2003-545287, XP002530387 & JP2002284786 A 20021003 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [DA] 1-21 * abstract * | by applicant | SE0300863 | WO9505739 | JPH07133207 | JPH08295608 | JPH08295609 | JPH0978007 | EP0823462 | WO9805719 | EP0831134 | JPH10182322 | EP0877061 | JPH1180166 | JPH11199801 | JPH11292883 | JPH11322763 | JP2000143417 | JP2000143672 | JP2000290317 | JP2000297118 | JP2000302614 | EP1245592 | JP2002284786 | JP2002301494 | JP2002356475 | JP2002363014 | JP2002363187 | US6762227 | WO2007015676 |