EP2078702 - Apparatus and discontinuous method for cleaning waste water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gassner, Kurt Untermallebarn 58 2011 Sierndorf / AT | [2012/25] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states GASSNER, Kurt Untermallebarn 58 A-2011 Sierndorf / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/29] | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08172564.0 | 22.12.2008 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | AT20070002081 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: AT 20812007 | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078702 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078702 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/00, C02F3/12 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
C02F3/006 (EP);
C02F3/1263 (EP);
C02F2209/001 (EP);
C02F2209/11 (EP);
C02F2209/42 (EP);
C02F2209/44 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Extension states | AL | 12.01.2010 | BA | 12.01.2010 | RS | 12.01.2010 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung sowie diskontinuierliches Verfahren zur Abwasserreinigung | [2009/29] | English: | Apparatus and discontinuous method for cleaning waste water | [2009/29] | French: | Appareil et procédé discontinu de nettoyage des eaux usées | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | GB | 22.12.2012 | IE | 22.12.2012 | LU | 22.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
GB | 22.12.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
LU | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
GB | 22.12.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
GB | 22.12.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 22.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 20.06.2012 | |
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4719359 (ROSE THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 7 - line 13; figures 1,3 * * column 12, line 25 - column 13, line 51 *; | [AD]AT503287 (GASSNER KURT ING [AT]) [AD] 12-15 * page 5, paragraph 6 - paragraph 8; figure 1; claims 1-12 *; | [Y]GB1239614 (TELEFUNKEN PATENTVERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, line 76 - line 83; figures 1-4 * * page 2, line 39 - line 93 * * page 3, line 16 - line 35 *; | [Y]US6672156 (BURNS ALAN ALEXANDER [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 15 - line 20; figure 1; claims 1-16 * * column 9, line 1 - line 25 * * column 4, line 17 - line 48 * * column 8, line 45 - line 67 *; | [A]DE1079554 (STADTWERKE KREFELD) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 3 - line 22; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE1160407 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 29 - line 44; figure 1 * * column 6, line 27 - line 58 * | Examination | EP0019055 | WO0043322 | by applicant | AT503287 | GB2034296 | US5421995 |