EP2075620 - A decohered laser light production system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christie Digital Systems USA, Inc. 10550 Camden Drive Cypress, CA 90630 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Christie Digital Systems USA, Inc. 10550 Camden Drive Cypress CA 90630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domm, John 22 Westmeadow Drive Kitchener Ontario N2N 3R2 / CA | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2013/46] |
Former [2010/40] | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Gevers, François, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 08172578.0 | 22.12.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | US20070964394 | 26.12.2007 Original published format: US 964394 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2075620 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/48, H04N5/74, H04N9/31 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
G02B27/48 (EP,US);
H04N9/3129 (EP,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,US);
H01S3/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/10] |
Former [2009/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Erzeugung von Laserlicht mit verringerter Kohärenz | [2009/27] | English: | A decohered laser light production system | [2009/27] | French: | Système de production de lumière laser à décohérence | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/30] | 16.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2016 | 17.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006090857 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 14 * abstract *; | US2008158512 [ ] (MIZUSHIMA TETSURO [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * figures 1,5 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] *; | [X]DE10350243 (FACHHOCHSCHULE MANNHEIM HOCHSC [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * claim 1 *; | [X]US6249381 (SUGANUMA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-13 * column 6, line 22 - line 36 * * figure 6 * | [XY] - IMAI M ET AL, "Speckle-pattern contrast of semiconductor laser propagating in a multimode optical fiber", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0030-4018, (19800401), pages 4 - 8, (19800401), XP025224983 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [Y] 14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(80)90081-4 |