Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
08.02.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2011 | Definitive list of designations | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
01.02.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.05.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |