EP2202497 - Flow meter housing manufactured by cold-forming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAMSTRUP A/S Industrivej 28 Stilling 8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borring, Peter Nordlund Kamstrup A/S Grejsdalsvej 164 7100 Vejle / DK | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 08172734.9 | 23.12.2008 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202497 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01F15/14 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
G01F15/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/10] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Durchflussmessergehäuse, das mittels Kaltumformen hergestellt wurde | [2010/26] | English: | Flow meter housing manufactured by cold-forming | [2010/26] | French: | Carter de débitmètre fabriqué par formage à froid | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003051559 (EHRLICH ANDREAS [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0016]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2170853 (CORNELL JR EDWARD S) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4856824 (CLAUSEN EDVIN L [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * column 3 - column 4 *; | [Y]GB2429061 (FLOWNETIX LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * page 1 - page 2 *; | [Y]DE19861186 (SCHUBERT & SALZER CONTROL SYST [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 6 *; | [Y]GB1083354 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [Y] 1-15 * page 4 * |