EP2204671 - Camera assisted sensor imaging system and multi aspect imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Stefan c/o Sony Deutschland GmbH Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Guthörl, Marc Karlstrasse 11 27749 Delmenhorst / DE | [2012/15] |
Former [2010/27] | 01 /
Koch, Stefan c/o Sony Deutschland GmbH Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Guthörl, Marc Karlstrasse 11 27749 Delmenhorst / DE | Representative(s) | Keck, Stephan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Phoenixbau Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Keck, Stephan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08173088.9 | 30.12.2008 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2204671 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2204671 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/48, G01S13/50, G01S17/89, G01S13/88, G01S13/89, G01S13/86, G06T7/00, H04N5/225, G06K9/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
G01S7/4802 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (EP,US);
G01S13/50 (EP,US);
G01S13/867 (EP,US);
G01S13/887 (EP,US);
G01S13/89 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/27] | G01S13/89, G01S13/86, G06T7/00, H04N5/225, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | Kameraunterstütztes Abtastabbildungssystem und Mehrfachaspekt-Abbildungssystem | [2010/27] | English: | Camera assisted sensor imaging system and multi aspect imaging system | [2010/27] | French: | Système d'imagerie à capteur assisté par caméra et système d'imagerie d'aspects multiples | [2010/27] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2008 | AT | 11.04.2012 | BE | 11.04.2012 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | DK | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | HR | 11.04.2012 | IT | 11.04.2012 | LT | 11.04.2012 | LV | 11.04.2012 | MT | 11.04.2012 | PL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | NO | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | IS | 11.08.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | IE | 30.12.2012 | LU | 30.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
IE | 30.12.2012 | ||
LU | 30.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
IE | 30.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
IE | 30.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
IE | 30.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
IE | 30.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 11.04.2012 | |
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 11.04.2012 | |
NO | 11.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006274149 (YOSHIZAWA RYOUZO [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0059] , [0063] , [0069] - [0071] - [0058] , [0024] , [0039] , [0063] * [Y] 14; | [A]US2007206849 (SAKATA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]KR20070091061 (SAMSUNG TECHWIN CO LTD [KR]) [X] 15 * abstract * [Y] 14; | [X]JP2008241304 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009] * |