EP1950705 - Varying hand-drawn line width for display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCall, M. Kim@c/o Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 02 /
Piersol, Kurt W., @c/o Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | [2017/16] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
McCall, M. Kim c/o Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7054 / US | ||
02 /
Piersol, Kurt W., c/o Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7022 / US | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House (2nd Floor) Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250121.4 | 10.01.2008 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | US20070626995 | 25.01.2007 Original published format: US 626995 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1950705 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1950705 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1950705 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/20, G09G5/22, G06F3/048 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G06T11/203 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | G06T11/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2012/47] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Variierung der Dicke einer handgezeichneten Linie für eine Anzeige | [2008/31] | English: | Varying hand-drawn line width for display | [2008/31] | French: | Variation de largeur de ligne dessinée à la main à afficher | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 11.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | [2018/15] |
Former [2017/50] | ES | 19.04.2017 | |
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5155813 (DONOGHUE KAREN [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 1 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 25 *; | [X]US5347620 (ZIMMER MARK A [US]) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 16 * * column 6, line 35 - line 64 *; | [X]US5361333 (AHLQUIST JR JOHN B [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 2 *; | [X]US2003024748 (DRESEVIC BODIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract ** paragraph [0007] * |