EP1955676 - Femoral trochlea prostheses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Technology, Inc. 1800 West Center Street Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Jeffrey D. 748 Dogwood Lane Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US | 02 /
Griner, Adam M. 727 Graber Court Columbia City, Indiana 46725 / US | 03 /
Hodorek, Robert A. 2005 E. Blossom Lane Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US | 04 /
Parisi, Raymond C. 214 Laurelwood Court Wakarusa, Indiana 46573 / US | 05 /
Vanskyock, Brian E. 9717 Cinnabar Place Fort Wayne, Indiana 46804 / US | 06 /
Farling, Toby N. 126 East Deerwood Court Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Mays, Julie Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250441.6 | 06.02.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | US20070671645 | 06.02.2007 Original published format: US 671645 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955676 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955676 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/3877 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30892 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3895 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2009/17] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Femurtrochlea-Prothese | [2008/33] | English: | Femoral trochlea prostheses | [2008/33] | French: | Prothèses de trochlée fémorale | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 14.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2740325 (ROUSSEAU JACQUES MARIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 8 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6190415 (COOKE T DEREK V [SA], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 2, line 44 - line 64 * * column 3, line 9 - line 14 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]FR2682589 (LABOUREAU JACQUES PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 7 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US5702459 (HUMMER JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] * column 3, line 1 - line 21 * * figures 1-3 * |