EP1967892 - Contact lens and method of preventing or slowing myopia progression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Change - inventor | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auckland Uniservices Limited 70 Symonds Street Auckland / NZ | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, John R. 3 Apihai Street Orakei, Auckland / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
Phillips, John R. 3 Apihai Street Orakei Auckland / NZ | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250809.4 | 10.03.2008 | [2008/37] | Priority number, date | NZ20070553763 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: NZ 55376307 | US20070905821P | 09.03.2007 Original published format: US 905821 P | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967892 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
G02C7/044 (EP,KR,US);
G02C7/042 (EP,KR,US);
G02C2202/24 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | Kontaktlinse und Verfahren zum Verhindern oder Verlangsamen von progressiver Myopie | [2008/37] | English: | Contact lens and method of preventing or slowing myopia progression | [2008/37] | French: | Lentille de contact et procédé pour la prévention ou le ralentissement de la myopie progressive | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | 09.06.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2015 | 17.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP15170723.9 / EP2980632 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0742464 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [X] 1-25,27-30,32-45* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5929969 (ROFFMAN JEFFREY H [US]) [X] 1-25,27-30,32-45 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 34; figures 1,7,9,11 *; | [XD]WO2006004440 (AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LTD [NZ], et al) [XD] 1-45 * figures 1-5; claim 1 * | Examination | US2003058407 | by applicant | WO2006004440 |