25.09.2015 |
Change - inventor |
|
12.06.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
12.06.2015 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
09.06.2015 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
27.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2013 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
01.11.2013 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
01.11.2013 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.09.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.05.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
08.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.11.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.08.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.04.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
03.04.2009 |
First examination report |
|
30.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
08.08.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |