EP1972697 - Aluminum alloy in mold for tire and tire mold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yano, Masashi Bridgestone Corporation Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250827.6 | 11.03.2008 | [2008/39] | Priority number, date | JP20070077512 | 23.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007077512 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972697 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/08 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
B29C33/38 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/22] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aluminiumlegierung in einer Form oder einem Reifen und Reifenform | [2008/39] | English: | Aluminum alloy in mold for tire and tire mold | [2008/39] | French: | Alliage d'aluminium dans moule pour pneu et moule de pneu | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 25.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3279915 (SHOICHI FUJISAWA, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 62 - line 72 *; | [A]GB1384264 (HONSEL WERKE AG) [A] 1-3 * table 3 *; | [A]JPH01149938 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0853133 (RHEINFELDEN ALUMINIUM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 25 - line 31; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1138794 (CORUS ALUMINIUM VOERDE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3* table 1 *; | [X]WO03052151 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, column 12 - column 13; table 1 *; | [A] - WPI WORLD PATENT INFORMATION DERWENT, DERWENT, GB, (19890613), XP002053498 [A] 1,2 * abstract * |