EP1974697 - Mobile tibial bearing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jordan S 3109 E 100 N Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
Lee, Jordan S 3109 e 100 N Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251213.8 | 29.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | US20070909127P | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 909127 P | US20080049753 | 17.03.2008 Original published format: US 49753 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974697 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1974697 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/3868 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3895 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Bewegliche Schienbeinlageranordnung | [2008/40] | English: | Mobile tibial bearing assembly | [2008/40] | French: | Ensemble mobile d'appui tibial | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2010 | BE | 17.11.2010 | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | HR | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | LT | 17.11.2010 | LV | 17.11.2010 | MT | 17.11.2010 | NL | 17.11.2010 | PL | 17.11.2010 | RO | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | TR | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | NO | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | ES | 28.02.2011 | IS | 17.03.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | LU | 29.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
TR | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
LU | 29.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
LU | 29.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2663536 (IMPLANTS INSTR CH FAB [FR]) [A] * page 8, line 13 - line 31 ** figures 7,8 *; | [Y]US5282868 (BAHLER ANDRE [CH]) [Y] 3,8 * column 12, line 54 - line 56 * * column 12, line 61 - column 13, line 3 * * figures 11,17,20,24 *; | [XY]FR2702369 (VOYDEVILLE GILLES [FR], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * page 3, line 19 - page 7, line 10 * * figure - * [Y] 3,8; | [X]FR2885516 (AUBANIAC JEAN MANUEL [FR]) [X] 1,4-7,9 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 26 * * figures 1,5-10 * |