EP1990302 - Transverse tab application method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curt G. Joa, Inc. 100 Crocker Avenue P.O. Box 903 Sheboygan Falls Wisconsin 53085 / US | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrews, Robert E. N.7488 Sunset Circle Drive Sheboygan Wisconsin 53083 / US | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251252.6 | 31.03.2008 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | US20070800627 | 07.05.2007 Original published format: US 800627 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1990302 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1990302 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990302 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/14, B65H35/08, A61F13/15, B65H35/00 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
B65H39/14 (EP,US);
A61F13/15756 (EP,US);
B65H2301/324 (EP,US);
B65H2408/2171 (EP,US);
B65H2601/521 (EP,US);
B65H2801/57 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/46] | B65H39/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anbringung eines querlaufenden Streifens | [2008/46] | English: | Transverse tab application method and apparatus | [2008/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'application d'un morceau de ruban transversal | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 25.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2008 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | CH | 31.03.2021 | IE | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | LU | 31.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 31.03.2008 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03031177 (PARAGON TRADE BRANDS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 17, line 15 - page 18, line 22 * * abstract *; | [Y]US2004216830 (VAN EPEREN DAVID J [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] *; | [XY]US2006201619 (ANDREWS ROBERT E [US]) [X] 16-20 * abstract * * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 | by applicant | US6475325 |